# Faster Calculations with Vedic Maths – 1

## It's exam season. For all those who are worried about Maths and calculations, here we republish one of the time-tested ways to do mental calculations fast. Try it and see how your speed improves.

Vedic Maths involves mental calculation techniques that, if practised well, can reduce your calculation time drastically. Many institutes teach this as a part of their curriculum while preparing for entrance examinations. We recommend you to try this once and judge for yourself the effectiveness of these techniques or tricks.

In Vedic Maths, there are various methods of multiplication. Regular practice will enable you to choose the one that best suits a particular problem. Below are some simple multiplication methods that can really improve your calculation speed.

**Method 1:**

How to multiply when one number ends with 9?

**Example 1: 33 x 29**

Step 1: Since 29 ends with 9, we will focus on this number.

29 is succeeded by 30. So we will multiply the given number (in this case 33) by 30.

33 x 30 = 990

Step 2: The difference between 30 and 29 is 1. This 1 needs to be multiplied with 33 which gives us 33 as answer. We will now subtract 33 from 990 to get the correct answer.

990 – 33 = 957

957 is our answer (33 x 29 = 957)

Isn’t is simple?

Try this with other examples. Below is an example when one number is a two-digit and the other a three-digit.

**Example 2: 59 x 437**

Step 1: 60 x 437 = 26220

Step 2: 26220 -437 = 25783

Answer: 59 x 437 = 25783

**Method 2:**

How do we multiply two-digit numbers where the sum of the numbers at tens digit is 10 and the units digit is same?

**Example 1: 37 x 77**

In the above example, the units digits is the same (7) and the sum of the numbers at tens digits (3 + 7) is 10.

Step 1: Multiply the tens digits

3 x 7 = 21

Step 2: Add units digit to the answer obtained in step 1

21 + 7 = 28

Step 3: Multiply the units digits

7 x 7 = 49

(We need a two-digit answer in this step. In case, the answer is not a two-digit number, then we will add zero in the tens place)

Step 4: Combine the answers obtained in step 2 and 3. The combined figure is the answer.

2849 (37 x 77 = 2849)

**Example 2: 83 x 23**

Step 1: Multiply the tens digits

8 x 2 = 16

Step 2: Add units digit to the answer obtained in step 1

16 + 3 = 19

Step 3: Multiply the units digits

3 x 3 = 9 Since we need a two-digit answer in this step, we will add zero before 9. So, 3 x 3 = 09

Step 4: Combine the answers obtained in step 2 and 3. The combined figure is the answer.

1909 is the answer (83 x 23 = 1909)

Does these not sound too simple? Vedic Maths offers several such techniques. We will discuss some more techniques in our subsequent articles. Till then, practice them well.

**SEE ALSO:**

Vedic Maths: For Fast Calculations – Part 2

Vedic Maths: For Fast Calculations – Part 3

**Do you feel strongly about something? Have a story to share? Write to us at ***info@thepeepertimes.com** or connect with us on Facebook or ***Twitter *** *