# Vedic Maths: For Fast Calculations – Part 2

## While interacting with a student, PM Modi spoke about Vedic Maths in his recent #MannKiBaat. Do you want to know how it can improve your calculation speed? Here, we are republishing the second article of our 5-article series on Vedic Maths. You can check all the articles in our section SUBJECT CHECK

*In Part 1, we taught you how to multiply two-digit numbers where the units digit is same and the sum of the numbers at tens digit is 10?*

**Now, let’s interchange them. **

**Method 3:**

How do we find the product of two-digit numbers where tens digit is the same and the sum of the units digits is 10?

For example,

34 x 36

Note the sum of the units digits (4+6) is 10 and the tens digits of the two numbers is the same, i.e, 3

**Step 1:**

Multiply the tens digit with its next number.

3 x 4 = 12

**Step 2:**

Multiply the units digits

4 x 6 = 24

**Step 3:**

Combine the answers obtained in step 1 and 2 to get the correct answer:

1224 (34 x 36 = 1224)

Simple! Isn’t it?

**Method 4:** Multiplication by factors

**Example 1: 44 x 14**

Since we know 14 = 2 x 7, multiplication by 14 can be easily achieved. Hence, in order to multiply any number by 14, we will first multiply it by 2 and then multiply the answer by 7.

**Step 1:**

44 x 14 = 44 x (2 x 7)

**Step 2:**

First multiply 44 by 2, i.e,

44 x 2 = 88

**Step 3:**

Multiply the number obtained in step 2 with 7 to get the answer, i.e.,

88 x 7 = 616

Answer: 44 x 14 = 616

**Example 2:**

**Step 1:**

79 x 81 = 79 x (9 x 9)

**Step 2:**

Multiply 79 by 9, i.e,

79 x 9 = 711

**Step 3:**

Multiply the number obtained in step 2 with 9 to get the answer, i.e.,

711 x 9 = 6399

Answer: 79 x 81 = 6399

**Method 5:** When the multiplication involves 25 or 50

**Example: 44 x 25**

We know that 25 is one-quarter of 100, that is, 100 /4 = 25. So instead of multiplying by 25, we will multiply the number by 100 and then divide the answer by 4.

**Step 1:**

44 x 25 = 44 x 100/4

**Step 2:**

Multiply the number by 100

44 x 100 = 4400

**Step 3:**

Divide the answer obtained in Step 2 with 4

4400/4 = 1100

The number obtained is the required answer, i.e, 44 x 25 = 1100

Similarly, when multiplying with 50, the fraction will become 100/2. The rest of the method will remain the same.

**SEE ALSO:**

1. Vedic Maths: For Fast Calculations – I

2. Vedic Maths: For Fast Calculations – Part 3

**Do you feel strongly about something? Have a story to share? Write to us at ***info@thepeepertimes.com** or connect with us on Facebook or ***Twitter *** *